Miles v. Jenkins et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Aljawon Dawyane Miles
Defendant: Tyrone Jenkins, Michael Oree, Domonique Whitley and Chermane Baskins
Case Number: 2:2011cv00150
Filed: March 3, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/23/11. (djy, )
May 26, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 25 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Ira De Ment on 5/26/2011. (dmn)
April 7, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order be and the same is hereby DENIED as further set out in the order. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be REFERRED to the United States Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 4/7/2011. (dmn)
March 21, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that the 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 3/21/2011. (dmn)
March 9, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $13.50 be paid on or before 3/30/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Bullock Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr. on 3/9/2011.(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Jenkins et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aljawon Dawyane Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone Jenkins
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Oree
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domonique Whitley
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chermane Baskins
Represented By: Benjamin Howard Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?