Moore v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. et al

Plaintiff: Janie Moore
Defendant: Group Life Insurance Plan, Dependent Life Benefits for Southern Company Services, Inc. and Associated or Affiliated Companies, Southern Company Services, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00170
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion to Seal, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/16/11. (scn, )
July 13, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the 39 Motion to Compel be and is hereby GRANTED and that on or before 7/18/2011, Met Life shall produce to the plaintiff the four documents listed on the privilege log as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/13/2011. (dmn)
June 27, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Moore's motions to compel Southern Company to produce documents exchanged between it and Met Life concerning the claim at issue, (Doc. 25 ) and to compel Southern Company to respond to her request for admission on the basis Met Life informed her was the reason her claim was denied (Doc. 26 ) are DENIED. 2. Moore's 24 Motion to Strike the Defendants' objections to producing privilege logs and compel their overdue production, is GRANTED. By separ ate order entered prior to the date on which this opinion and order were entered, the court ordered Met Life to serve a privilege log on Moore on or before 6/27/2011. 3. Moore's motion to compel production and identification of manuals, guidelin es and other documents governing the manner in which Met Life makes claims decisions for her plan. (Doc. 20 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Met Life shall produce all written procedures, rules, guidelines or other governing documents which applied i n any way to the resolution of Moore's claim. 4. Moore's motion to compel production of documents detailing or explaining Met Life's organizational structure in which the persons who were involved in her claim pursuant to plan worked ( Doc. 22 ) is DENIED. 5. Moore's motion to compel production of application documents for her plan and documents evidencing other plans or coverages provided to her (Doc. 23 ) is DENIED. 6. Moore's motion to compel production of documents and information relevant under supreme court precedent concerning Met Life's conflict of interest (Doc. 21 ) is GRANTED as further set out in the order. In all other respects, the plaintiff's motion to compel is DENIED. It is further ORDER ED that Met Life shall comply with the provisions of this order requiring responses or production on or before 7/1/2011. It is further ORDERED that on or before 2:00 p.m., 7/1/2011, the parties shall agree upon and submit to the court a proposed prot ective order covering the documents which must be produced pursuant to this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/27/2011. (dmn) [Modified on 6/27/2011 to reflect that 29 Motion for Expedited Hearing and 34 Motion for Protective Order terminated per instruction of Judge Coody.-DMN]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Life Insurance Plan, Dependent Life Benefits for Southern Company Services, Inc. and Associated or Affiliated Companies
Represented By: William Posey Cobb, II
Represented By: JoClaudia Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Company Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Posey Cobb, II
Represented By: JoClaudia Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Moore
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: Thomas O'Neal Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?