Miller v. Covington County Jail et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Carl Edward Miller
Defendant: Dr. McWohlters, Preston Hughes, Dennis Meeks and Southern Health Partners
Case Number: 2:2011cv00209
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 25 Recommendation; dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/26/2011. (br, )
April 14, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION adopting the 5 Recommendation; dismissing the Plaintiff's claims against the Covington County Jail with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); dismissing this party as a defendant; referring the case with respect to the remaining defendants back to the Magistrate. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 4/14/2011. (br, )
March 23, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Covington County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 3/23/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Covington County Jail et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. McWohlters
Represented By: Robert Newell Bailey, II
Represented By: Daniel Farris Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Hughes
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Represented By: Mallory M. Combest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Meeks
Represented By: Gary Lee Willford, Jr.
Represented By: Mallory M. Combest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Represented By: Robert Newell Bailey, II
Represented By: Daniel Farris Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?