Henderson et al v. Bentley et al

Plaintiff: Louis Henderson, Dana Harley, Darrell Robinson, Dwight Smith, Albert Knox, John Hicks, Melinda Washington, David Smith and James Douglas
Defendant: Robert Bentley, Kim Thomas, Billy Mitchem, Frank Albright, Bettina Carter and Edward Ellington
Case Number: 2:2011cv00224
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 346 Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees is granted as follows: Defendants shall pay Plaintiffs counsel ninety-nine thousand dollars and no cents ($ 99,000.00) in full satisfaction of any claim for attorneys fees , expenses, and costs within thirty (30) days of this Order. The other 334 Motion for Attorneys Fees is denied as moot. Upon notification that payment has been made, the Court will dismiss this action with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 12/8/2015. (dmn, )
November 21, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO COUNSEL, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2012. (wcl, )
September 5, 2012 199 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that the dfts' 34 MOTION to Dismiss is denied with the understanding that the court will address the res judicata issue after the bench trial. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
October 3, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that: (1) The dfts' 55 Motion for Extension of Deadline for the Rule 26(f) Report is granted; (2) The Rule 26(f) discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable but not later than 10/17/2011; (3) The plfs' 60 Motion for Lea ve to File Second Amended Complaint is granted, as further set out in order; (4) Any response to the 61 Second Amended Complaint is due on 10/17/2011, as further set out in order; (5) Finally, the dfts are allowed until 10/17/2011, to file any stat ement as to how the addition of the three plfs will affect, if at all, class certification. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/3/2011. (wcl, ) (Main Document 66 replaced on 10/3/2011 to attach the correct PDF document due to a clerical error) (wcl, ). Modified on 10/3/2011 (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Henderson
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Harley
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Robinson
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Smith
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Knox
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hicks
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Washington
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Douglas
Represented By: Allison Neal
Represented By: Rose Saxe
Represented By: Robert David Segall
Represented By: Carl Takei
Represented By: Margaret Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Thomas
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Mitchem
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettina Carter
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Scott Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?