Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Alabama Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc.
Defendant: Alabama Department of Transportation, John R. Cooper, Federal Highway Administration and Mark Bartlett
Case Number: 2:2011cv00267
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' motion for sanctions 87 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/30/2013. (jg, )
March 25, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that CRT's motion to intervene 91 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/25/2013. (jg, )
September 27, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 76 is GRANTED as further set out; All other pending motions 35 , 37 , 45 , 47 , 48 , 49 , 54 , 58 , 60 are DENIED, without prejudice and with leave to refile any that remain relevant; The Uniform Scheduling Order 27 is VACATED; The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer within 14 days after the responsive pleadings or motions of Defendants as further set out; The parties are ORDERED to submit to the court a report of that meeting within 21 days of the last Defendants' responsive pleading or motion to the Second Amended Complaint; With respect to any charge that Plaintiff engaged in gamesmanship in the premature filing of this case, Defendants shall SHOW CAUSE, with a joint brief not to exceed 15 pages, on or before October 25, 2012 as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/27/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc. v. Alabama Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc.
Represented By: Gilbert B. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Transportation
Represented By: Floyd Ray Gilliland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Cooper
Represented By: Floyd Ray Gilliland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bartlett
Represented By: James Joseph DuBois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?