Franklin v. Arbor Station (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Defendant: Arbor Station
Case Number: 2:2011cv00294
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The plf's 34 Objections to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge are overruled; 2) The 33 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is adopted; 3) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to 28 USC § 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/31/2013. (wcl, )
April 21, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/21/2011. Copy mailed to Justin Matthew Parnell as directed.(wcl, )
April 18, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Terry F. Moorer for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Hon. Chief Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/18/2011. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Arbor Station (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arbor Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?