McPherson v. Groupon, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Michael McPherson
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00342
Filed: May 4, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2011 Received E-MAIL from USDC/Southern District of California re receipt of transfer of case. New Case Number assigned by USDC, Southern District of California is 11cv1551-DMS(RBB). (dmn)
July 13, 2011 Case transferred to USDC, Southern District of California. Notices sent to Clerk, SDCA via E-MAIL as requested with copies of pdf documents (zip file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet) from this court. (dmn)
July 13, 2011 16 Received from the Clerk, USDC, Southern District of California via E-MAIL a copy of Conditional Transfer Order entered on 6/14/2011 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this action to USDC, Southern District of California. (dmn)
June 9, 2011 15 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Groupon, Inc. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/20/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order & Sample Format)(dmn)
June 8, 2011 14 Featured Case STAMPED ORDER granting 8 Motion for CHRISTOPHER M. YOUNG to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/2011. (dmn)
June 8, 2011 13 Featured Case STAMPED ORDER granting 10 Motion for SHIRLI F. WEISS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/2011. (dmn)
June 8, 2011 12 Featured Case STAMPED ORDER granting 9 Motion for NOAH A. KATSELL to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/8/2011.(dmn)
June 6, 2011 11 PRO HAC VICE Filing fees for Noah A. Katsell, Shirli Fabbri Weiss, and Christopher M. Young re 8 Motion, 9 Motion and 10 Motion received: $150.00, receipt number 4602018779. (dmn)
June 3, 2011 10 Motion for SHIRLI F. WEISS to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Groupon, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehman, Anthony) [Modified on 6/6/2011 to include name of attorney requesting appearance.-DMN]
June 3, 2011 9 Motion for NOAH A. KATSELL to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Groupon, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehman, Anthony) [Modified on 6/6/2011 to include attorney's name requesting the appearance.-DMN]
June 3, 2011 8 Motion for CHRISTOPHER M. YOUNG to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Groupon, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certicate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehman, Anthony) [Modified on 6/7/2011 to include name of attorney requesting appearance.-DMN]
May 26, 2011 7 Featured Case STAMPED ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/26/2011. (dmn)
May 26, 2011 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Groupon, Inc. (dmn) (NO PDF ATTACHED)
May 25, 2011 ***Attorney Shirli F. Weiss, Christopher M. Young, and Noah A. Katsell added for Groupon, Inc. (dmn) (see Doc. 6 for pdf)
May 25, 2011 6 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Groupon, Inc., and Michael McPherson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehman, Anthony) [Modified on 5/26/2011 to reflect that this is a "Joint" motion and to add additional filer who was omitted at original time of filing.-DMN]
May 18, 2011 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Rudolph Turner for Groupon, Inc. served on 5/10/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (dmn)
May 13, 2011 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Michael McPherson re 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Irby, Robert)
May 6, 2011 2 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Michael McPherson. Corporate Disclosures due by 5/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order & Sample Format)(dmn)
May 5, 2011 3 Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Groupon, Inc. (dmn)
May 5, 2011 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Michael McPherson. (dmn) (NO PDF ATTACHED)
May 4, 2011 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael McPherson. (dmn) (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 1 for pdf.)
May 4, 2011 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Groupon, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602018391), filed by Michael McPherson. (Attachments: # 1 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McPherson v. Groupon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McPherson
Represented By: James Michael Terrell
Represented By: Robert Brent Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Noah A. Katsell
Represented By: Anthony Darrell Lehman
Represented By: Shirli F. Weiss
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?