Builders Flooring Connection, LLC v. Brown Chambless Architects, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Builders Flooring Connection, LLC |
Defendant: |
Brown Chambless Architects, LLC, Goodwyn, Mills & Cawood, Inc., 2WR Holmes Wilkins Architects, Inc., JMR Architecture, PC, PH&J Architects, Inc., Infinity Architecture, P.C., Weiss Flooring, Inc., Robert P. Weiss, III, Wanda C. Blake and McKean & Associates, Architects, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00373 |
Filed: |
May 13, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama |
Office: |
Montgomery Office |
County: |
Elmore |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles S. Coody |
Presiding Judge: |
Myron H. Thompson |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
249
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that the dft's 224 motion to compel is GRANTED with respect to the requests for production of documents # 18 and 19; further ORDERED that the plf's 228 motion for a protective order be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/16/2014. (wcl, )
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
243
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 224 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED, as further set out in order; (2) the 224 motion to compel is DENIED with respect to interrogatories #18 and 19, and requests for production #3, 12, 13 , 14, and 15; (3) the court reserves ruling on the requests for production of documents #18 and 19; the plf may file a supplemental brief addressing the discoverability of the settlement documents at issue on or before 10/3/2014; the defendant may fi le a reply brief to the plf's response on or before 10/10/2014; (4) GMC's 230 MOTION to to tender its experts for deposition be and is hereby GRANTED; the 230 motion to strike the expert witness reports be and is hereby DENIED; (5) GMC's 239 motion for an extension of time for expert disclosures and 237 motion for an extension of the Daubert and dispositive motions deadlines be and are hereby GRANTED; the deadline for expert witness disclosures is extended to 10/25/2014, and the Daubert and dispositive motions deadlines are extended to 11/21/2014; GMC's 237 motion for sanctions be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/26/14. (djy, )
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing
210
ORDER directing as follows: (1) that the plaintiff's 202 MOTION to Compel be and is hereby GRANTED to the extent that the def shall provide an updated Public Project list that includes all Alabama projects from 2013 until the first quart er of 2014; (2) that, with respect to interrogatories # 5, 6, 10 and 11 in which the plf seeks information on whether flooring contractors were consulted on each Alabama project and the names of the flooring contractors consulted, the motion to c ompel be and is hereby GRANTED, as further set out in order; (3) That, with respect to interrogatories # 12, 13, 14, 15 and 16 regarding non- Alabama projects, because the information sought is outside the relevant market and too attenuated to be relevant to a claim in this action, the motion to compel be and is hereby DENIED; (4) That the plfs motion to compel (doc. # 202) be and is hereby DENIEDin all other respects. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/1/14. (djy, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Builders Flooring Connection, LLC v. Brown Chambless Architects, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Builders Flooring Connection, LLC |
Represented By: |
Charles Alexander Dauphin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Brown Chambless Architects, LLC |
Represented By: |
William Carlos Spaht |
Represented By: |
Charles Andrew Stewart, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Goodwyn, Mills & Cawood, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Matthew Ross Griffith |
Represented By: |
Steven Keith Herndon |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: 2WR Holmes Wilkins Architects, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Dennis Ray Bailey |
Represented By: |
John Evans Bailey |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: JMR Architecture, PC |
Represented By: |
Dennis Ray Bailey |
Represented By: |
John Evans Bailey |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: PH&J Architects, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Charles Burton Paterson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Infinity Architecture, P.C. |
Represented By: |
Greer Burdick Mallette |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Weiss Flooring, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Carla Cole Gilmore |
Represented By: |
Simeon Franklin Penton |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Robert P. Weiss, III |
Represented By: |
Carla Cole Gilmore |
Represented By: |
Simeon Franklin Penton |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wanda C. Blake |
Represented By: |
David R. Boyd |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: McKean & Associates, Architects, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?