Snowden v. Hetzel et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Jeff Alexander Snowden
Defendant: Luther Strange and Gary Hetzel
Case Number: 2:2011cv00379
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after a review of the 31 Recommendation, and after an independent review of the entire record, the court finds that the Recommendation should be adopted. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is hereby ADOPTED and the petition for habeas corpus relief filed by Jeff Alexander Snowden is DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/30/14. (scn, )
July 5, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the instant habeas petition be held in ABEYANCE pending completion of Petitioner's pending Rule 32 proceedings. Respondents shall file notice with the court upon completion of said proceedings, and in no event, not more than ten (10) days after Petitioner's post-conviction proceedings become final in accordance with the state's procedural rules. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 7/5/2011. (br, )
June 21, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION granting 12 MOTION to Amend; answers to the amended petition due 7/12/2011. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 6/21/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snowden v. Hetzel et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Audrey Kathleen Jones Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Represented By: Audrey Kathleen Jones Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Alexander Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?