Mayo v. Bentley et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: David Lee Mayo
Defendant: Warden Heitzel, Mr. Anglin, Gwendolyn Babers, Anthony Askew, Robert Bentley, Kim Tobias Thomas, Gwendolyn Mosley, Louis Boyd and Kenneth Sconyers
Case Number: 2:2011cv00392
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) the defendants' motion to dismiss be GRANTED; (2) judgment be GRANTED in favor of the defendants; (3) this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; (4) the costs of this proceeding be taxed against the plaintiff Objections to R&R due by 9/17/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/3/14. (djy, )
September 1, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 9/22/2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' answer and written report, as supplemented, as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/1/2011. (dmn)
August 26, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION denying 33 Renewed Motion for Appointment of Counsel as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/26/2011. (dmn)
August 17, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 15 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that: 1. Plaintiffs amended complaint against Defendants Mosley, Boyd, Sconyers, Babers, Bentley, and Thomas is DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of proce ss pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 2. Defendants Mosley, Boyd, Sconyers, Babers, Bentley, and Thomas are DISMISSED as parties to the complaint, as amended; and 3. This case with respect to the remaining defendants is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/17/2011. (dmn)
May 27, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 6/10/2011 Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint as further set out in the order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to furnish Plaintiff with a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/27/2011. Copy w/ complaint form mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayo v. Bentley et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Heitzel
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anglin
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Babers
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Askew
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Mosley
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Boyd
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?