Rainer v. United States of America (INMATE 3)

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Rainer
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00414
Filed: June 1, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) The petitioner's Objection to the Magistrate Judge Recommendation 48 filed on August 2, 2013 is overruled; (2) The Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 37 entered on May 22, 2013 is adopted;(3) The 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion filed by Rainer is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/14/2013. (jg, )
November 1, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 11/22/2011, the petitioner may file a reply to the supplemental response filed by the United States, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/1/2011. (wcl, )
July 13, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing US Attorney to file a response to petitioner's 2 §2255 Motion on or before 8/12/2011, as further set out in order; DIRECTING the CLERK to serve a copy of petitioner's §2255 motion upon the US Attorney for the ALMD. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/13/2011. (wcl, )
June 6, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that on or before 7/6/2011, Rainer shall advise this court whether he seeks to do one of the following: 1) Proceed before this court pursuant to 28 USC § 2255 on those claims presented in his 2 Motion; 2) Amend his motion to assert any additional claims pursuant to 28 USC § 2255 on which he wishes to challenge the conviction and sentence imposed upon him by this court; or 3) Withdraw his motion, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 6/6/2011. Copy mailed to petitioner with blank copy of 2255 form. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainer v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: John Thomas Harmon
Represented By: Matthew W. Shepherd
Represented By: W. Brent Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?