Arthur v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)

Plaintiff: Thomas D. Arthur
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas and Anthony Patterson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00438
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 386 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) Dfts' 364 Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment on Arthur's as-applied Eighth Amendment claim is GRANTED; and 2) Plf's 367 Motion for a New Trial on his Eighth Amendment claim is DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/19/2016. (wcl, )
October 5, 2015 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Arthur's 256 motion for leave to amend is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as further set out in order; further ORDERED that the State's 244 motion to dismiss is DENIED with LEAVE TO REFILE within 7 days after the filing of Arthur's third amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/5/2015. (wcl, )
August 28, 2015 259 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER; ORDER that the 248 Request for Discovery be construed as a motion to compel; ORDER granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion to Compel, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/28/2015. (wcl, )
February 17, 2015 219 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Arthur's Emergency Motion to Stay Execution (Doc. # 216 ) is GRANTED; Arthur's February 19, 2015 execution date is STAYED pending a trial and final decision on the merits of his claims, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on February 17, 2015. (scn, )
January 15, 2015 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 198 Emergency MOTION to Alter or Amend 195 Memorandum Opinion and Order, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/15/2015. (wcl, )
January 8, 2015 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plf shall respond, in writing, on or before 12:00pm, C.S.T., on 1/12/2015 re 198 Emergency MOTION to Alter or Amend 195 Memorandum Opinion and Order Filed January 5, 2015). Plf's resp shall be limited to 25 or less pages. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/8/2015. (kh, )
September 12, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows, pursuant to September 12, 2014 status conference: (1) On or before October 3, 2014, Plaintiff Thomas D. Arthur may file a motion to amend his complaint to amend his remaining Eighth Amendment claim and his Fourteenth Amend ment equal protection claim to reflect the States substitution of midazolam hydrochloride for pentobarbital in its lethal injection protocol, and shall provide the court with legal authority supporting the allowance of the amendment,a s further set out; (2) The State shall have 14 days from the date of filing of the motion to respond, and Arthur shall have seven days thereafter to reply. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/12/14. (scn, )
February 5, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 MOTION to Strike; The declarations of Dr. Strader (Doc. # 152 -1, Ex. 9.) and Dr. Heath (Doc. # 152 -1, Ex. 10) that were submitted with Arthur's brief in opposition to the State's motion for summary judgment are hereby STRICKEN; ORDER setting Status Conference for 3/4/2014, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2A, before Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/5/2014. (furn: Calendar, wr)(wcl, )
March 15, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 144 Motion for Clarification of 3/14/2013 Order is GRANTED. Plaintiff is not required to file a motion for summary judgment on or before 4/5/2013, and the Court will consider Plaintiff's opposition and supporting ev idence to any dispositive motion filed by Defendants. Pursuant to the briefing schedule set forth in the Court's 138 Order of 2/15/2013, Plaintiff shall file his response to Defendants' summary judgment motion on or before 4/19/2013. Defendants may file a reply on or before 4/26/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/15/2013. (dmn, )
February 15, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part the 135 Motion Regarding Discovery Deadline and Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule to the extent that it requests the discovery deadline in this case currently set to expire on 2/15/2013, be extended to 30 days after this Court decides the last of the outstanding discovery appeals and requests that the Court alter the summary judgment briefing schedule accordingly; DENIED to the extent that the motion seeks to open discovery beyond the two narro w discovery issues; further ORDERING that (1) The discovery deadline in this case shall be CONTINUED to 30 days after the Court resolves the last of the discovery appeals now pending before it; (2) the parties' motions for summary judgment shall be due two weeks after the close of fact discovery, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/15/13. (djy, )
January 17, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing Dfts' 23 Motion as a Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED that any supplemental briefs or evidence that Dfts or Plf wish to present to the Court be submitted on or before 2/22/2013; further ORDERED that the discovery deadline in this case, previously set to expire on 1/18/2013 (see Order, Doc. # 128 ), is hereby CONTINUED until 2/15/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 1/17/2013. (wcl, )
November 29, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the discovery deadline, previously set to expire on 12/3/2012, by 119 Order dated 11/2/2012, be continued until 1/18/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/29/2012. (wcl, )
October 31, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Dfts file a response to Plf's 107 Objections regarding (1) Judge Moorer's 89 Order denying Plf's Motion to Compel Entry Upon Land for Inspection; and (2) Judge Moorer's 99 Sealed Order on or before 11/9/2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/31/2012. (wcl, )
October 26, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING as MOOT the plaintiff's 104 Objections and response to Judge Moorer's 10/12/2012 order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/26/12. (djy, )
October 10, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Relating to the October 18-19 Hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/10/2012. (wcl, )
October 9, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/9/12. (scn, )
November 3, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 23 MOTION to Dismiss; declining supplemental jurisdiction over Count IV. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 11/3/2011. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Arthur
Represented By: Meredith Calandra
Represented By: Suhana S. Han
Represented By: Jordan Toumey Razza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: James Clayton Crenshaw
Represented By: Stephanie Elizabeth Reiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Patterson
Represented By: James Clayton Crenshaw
Represented By: Stephanie Elizabeth Reiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?