Perry et al v. Alabama Alcoholic Beverage Control Board et al

Plaintiff: Kesia J. Perry, Valencia Aaron and Stacy D. Taylor
Defendant: Alabama Beverage Control Board, Jeff Rogers, Stan Goolsby, Kenneth Davis and Jean Turner
Case Number: 2:2011cv00464
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 172 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1) Plfs' 168 Objection to Dfts' Bill of Costs is SUSTAINED in part and OVERRULED in part as set forth above; 2) The court taxes the sum of $16,591.52 against Plffs Kesia Perry, Valencia Aaron, and Stacy Taylor. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/26/2013. (wcl, )
September 23, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/23/13. (scn, )
November 20, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Permission for Steve McKitt to Attend Depositions. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/20/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Alabama Alcoholic Beverage Control Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesia J. Perry
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencia Aaron
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy D. Taylor
Represented By: Henry Wallace Blizzard, III
Represented By: Ann Carroll Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Beverage Control Board
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Represented By: Robert Sommerville Hill
Represented By: Robert Lester Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rogers
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Represented By: Robert Sommerville Hill
Represented By: Robert Lester Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Goolsby
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Represented By: Robert Sommerville Hill
Represented By: Robert Lester Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Davis
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Represented By: Robert Sommerville Hill
Represented By: Robert Lester Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Turner
Represented By: Joseph Wallace Adams
Represented By: Robert Sommerville Hill
Represented By: Robert Lester Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?