Stone v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Randall Dwight Stone
Defendant: Warden Kilby Correctional Facility, Kilby Correctional Facility, Correctional Medical Service and Captain Kilby Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2011cv00523
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 39 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for plf's failure to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/9/2013. (wcl, )
October 31, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The 24 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. Plaintiff's claims against the Kilby Correctional Facility and "Captain Kilby Correctional Facility" be DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i); 3. The Kilby Correctional Facility and "Captain Kilby Correctional Facility" are DISMISSED as parties to this complaint; 4. This case with respect to the remaining Defendants is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/31/2011. (jg, )
August 23, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 16 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/23/2011. (jg, )
July 5, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; that the clerk is DIRECTED to furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/5/2011. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Dwight Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?