Kelly v. Wright et al (INMATE2)(CONSENT)

Plaintiff: Eddie Mack Kelly
Defendant: Willie Cope, Dennis Riley, Homer Wright, Russell Thomas and Olivia Pearson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00540
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/15/13. (scn, )
October 4, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before October 25, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' 16 written report, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/4/11. (scn, )
July 29, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $19.18 be paid on or before 8/19/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit and 4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Draper Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/29/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Wright et al (INMATE2)(CONSENT)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Cope
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Represented By: Charles Winston Sheehan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Riley
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Represented By: Charles Winston Sheehan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Wright
Represented By: Charles Winston Sheehan, Jr.
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Thomas
Represented By: Charles Winston Sheehan, Jr.
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Pearson
Represented By: Emily Coody Marks
Represented By: Charles Winston Sheehan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Mack Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?