Differ v. Holland (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Dennis J. Differ
Defendant: Michael Holland
Case Number: 2:2011cv00572
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that this complaint is dismissed without prejudice in accordance with the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); that the clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; that this case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/2/2011. (cc, )
August 29, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Dennis J. Differ. ORDERED that on or before 9/12/2011, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint as further set out in the order on a form for use in filing 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint. See Local Rule 9 .1 (requiring pro se litigants to utilize court's forms). Plaintiff's original complaint shall be superseded by the amended complaint. This means Plaintiff shall no longer rely on the original complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaint iff a form for use in filing a complaint under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 to assist him in complying with the directives contained herein. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/29/2011. Copy with a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form mailed to Plaintiff as directed. (dmn)
August 10, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $2.66 be paid on or before 8/31/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Ventress Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/10/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Differ v. Holland (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Differ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?