Bell v. Patterson et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Tiffany LaShae Bell
Defendant: D. Patterson, Frank Albright and Lt. Carlson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00583
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 57 is ADOPTED. 2. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action properly and to comply with the orders of this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/21/2013. (jg, )
May 9, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that: 1. The plaintiff's objection 53 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on April 26, 2012 is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 52 filed on April 18, 2012 is adopted; 3. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 50 is DENIED and this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/9/2012. (jg, )
September 26, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel 6 , is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/26/2011. (jg, )
August 5, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $13.40 be paid on or before 8/26/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Julia Tutwiler Prison for Women. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/5/2011. (furn: Cashier) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Patterson et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany LaShae Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?