Franklin v. Dean (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Defendant: Richard C. Dean
Case Number: 2:2011cv00683
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Strike Jury Demand 63 is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial 64 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/4/2013. (jg, )
May 15, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 31 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and that Defendant Richard Dean's Motion to Dismiss 24 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/15/2012. (jg, )
January 27, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 20 Recommendation is adopted, and that Plaintiff Nue Cheer Franklin's motion for default judgment 19 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this action is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and a recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/27/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Dean (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nue Cheer Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?