Gantt v. Hughes, et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Carlos R. Gantt
Defendant: Preston Hughes and Dennis Meeks
Case Number: 2:2011cv00701
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER that the 19 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. A Judgment in favor of the Defendants shall be forthcoming. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 5/22/2013. (dmn, )
October 11, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that on or before November 1, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' answer and written report, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/11/11. (scn, )
August 31, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order.; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/31/11. (Furnished to Cashier and Finance) (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gantt v. Hughes, et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos R. Gantt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Hughes
Represented By: Julie Sorrells Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Meeks
Represented By: Julie Sorrells Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?