Gaines v. Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Henry Gaines
Defendant: Cliff Walker, Robert P. Longshore, Cynthia Dillard, Eddie Cook, Robert Oakes, Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles and William W. Wynne
Case Number: 2:2011cv00749
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 3/30/12. (scn, )
January 20, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, upon consideration of the prior proceedings, opinions and orders entered in this case, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff and that this action is dismissed; the clerk of the court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 1/20/12. (scn, )
September 23, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $15.46 be paid on or before 10/14/2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Elmore Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/23/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?