Mallory v. Hetzel et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Jacques G. Mallory
Defendant: Ms. Webb, Mr. McKinney, Ms. Wilson, Ms. Wood, Kenneth Sconyers and Gary Hetzel
Case Number: 2:2011cv00767
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION that the 19 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 1/5/2012. (jg, )
October 27, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before November 17, 2011 Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' answers and written reports as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/27/2011. (jg, )
September 16, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full, as further set out in order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Correction Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/16/11. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallory v. Hetzel et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Webb
Represented By: William Alexander Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. McKinney
Represented By: William Alexander Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wilson
Represented By: Philip Guy Piggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wood
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Hebert
Represented By: William Alexander Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Represented By: Bart Gregory Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques G. Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?