Jones v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Kenneth Jones
Defendant: Kenneth Jones and Sylvester Nettles
Case Number: 2:2011cv00870
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Bullock
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby AD OPTED, and that this case be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for the Plaintiffs abandonment of his claims, his failure to comply with the orders of the court, and the lack of merit to his claims. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 5/22/13. (scn, )
November 9, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 4 Recommendation be and is hereby ADOPTED, and that the 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be and is hereby DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this case be and is hereby REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 11/9/2011. (dmn)
October 14, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $46 be paid on or before November 4, 2011; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full;. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/14/11. (Furnished to Bullock Correctional Facility Account Clerk.)(Furnished to Cashier/Finance.) (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Jones et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?