McGuire v. City of Montgomery, et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. McGuire
Defendant: Kevin J. Murphy, D. T. Marshall, Hugh B. McCall, Luther Strange, City of Montgomery, Alabama Department of Public Safety and Todd Strange
Case Number: 2:2011cv01027
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 357 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that, on or before April 8, 2016, Defendants shall state, in writing, whether they dispute Plaintiff's assertion that he is currently homeless. Further, if Defendants contend that Plaintiff is not currently homeless, they shall submit an affidavit or other evidentiary material to support that contention. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/4/2016. (kh, )
August 27, 2015 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 285 motion for attorney's fees is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to re-file no later than fourteen days after entry of the mandate by the Court of Appeals on the pending appeal. Further, 346 the motion to strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/27/2015. (kh, )
February 5, 2015 283 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED and DECLARED that ASORCNA is unconstitutional under the Ex Post Facto Clause of the United States Constitution to the extent that it requires (1) in-town homeless registrants to register (or check-in) on a weekly basis with two separate law-enforcement jurisdictions as provided by § 15-20A-12(b) in conjunction with § 15-20A-4(13) and (2) all in-town registrants to complete travel permit applications with two separate law-enforcement jurisdict ions as provided by § 15-20A-15 in conjunction with § 15-20A-4(13). It is further ORDERED that the Attorney Generals oral Motion to Strike and Defendants oral Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/5/2015. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGuire v. City of Montgomery, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. McGuire
Represented By: Elizabeth Peyton Faulk
Represented By: Joseph Mitchell McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Murphy
Represented By: Jason Cole Paulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. T. Marshall
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Represented By: Constance Caldwell Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh B. McCall
Represented By: Joseph Haran Lowe, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Timothy McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Joshua K. Payne
Represented By: Winfield James Sinclair
Represented By: Peter John Smyczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?