LaFogg v. Chance et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Christopher Michael LaFogg
Defendant: Kevin Chance, Walter Inabwett and Opp Police Department
Case Number: 2:2011cv01102
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 20 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. 2. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. 3. No costs are taxed herein. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 4/11/2012. (dmn, )
March 21, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's false imprisonment claim against the named defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to t he provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); 2. This case with respect to the plaintiffs remaining claim against defendants i.e., the excessive force claim is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additionalproceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 3/21/2012. (dmn, )
February 1, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 7 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's claims against the Opp Police Department are DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(I); 2. The Opp Police Department is DISMISSED as a party to this complaint; and 3. This case with respect to the remaining defendants is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 2/1/2012. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFogg v. Chance et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Michael LaFogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Inabwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opp Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?