United States of America v. The State of Alabama et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The State of Alabama and Beth Chapman
Case Number: 2:2012cv00179
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the 167 MOTION to Amend Deadlines as follows: (1) Paragraph V.2. of the 119 remedial order is amended such that, for the 2016 primary election only, the deadline for providing certifications to counsel for the United States shall be the 42nd day before the election; (2) Paragraph V.2. of the 119 remedial order is amended such that, for the 2016 primary election only, the deadline for the State to compile the data from the county certifications into a spreadsheet f ormat devised in consultation with the United States and to file both the county certifications and the spreadsheet electronically with the court shall be the 40th day before the election. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/25/15. (djy, )
May 4, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the final judgment of this court made and entered on February 11, 2014 (doc. no. 121 ), is continued in full force and effect, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on May 4, 2015. (scn, )
March 14, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 126 Unopposed Motion to Amend this Court's Remedial Order is granted; as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/14/14. (scn, )
March 9, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the final opinion in support of the 21 preliminary injunction shall issue on March 12, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/9/12. (scn, )
February 28, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 5 Motion for TRO, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 2/28/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Risa Berkower
Represented By: Richard Dellheim
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doyle
Represented By: Thomas Christian Herren, Jr
Represented By: T. Russell Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Alabama
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Chapman
Represented By: James William Davis
Represented By: Misty Shawn Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?