Green v. Mobis Alabama, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Noria C. Green
Defendant: Mobis Alabama, LLC and Jeremy Powers
Case Number: 2:2012cv00277
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 188 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that non-party Barnett's 158 application for an award of attorney's fees be and is hereby GRANTED, and Barnett is AWARDED attorney's fees in the amount of $3,458, payable by Attorney Alicia K. Haynes, see FRCP 45(d)(1), within 15 days from the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/16/2014. (wcl, )
March 25, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1) Green's 137 objection to courier costs is MOOT; 2) Green's 137 objection to deposition transcript costs is MOOT insofar as MOBIS withdrew the $94.35 fee from Noria Green's deposition transcript and is ot herwise OVERRULED; 3) Green's 137 objection to MOBIS's witness fees is OVERRULED; 4) Green's 137 objection to MOBIS's copying costs is SUSTAINED; 5) Pursuant to Rule 54(d)(1) and 28 USC § 1920, $5,972.68 in costs are awarded to MOBIS for which execution may issue, said sum consisting of the amounts listed in the 134 Bill of Costs less the $1,045.92 withdrawn by MOBIS and MOBIS's request for copying costs. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 3/25/2014. (wcl, )
February 5, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as follows: 1) Green's 78 Motion to Strike the Declaration of Kevin Green is GRANTED; 2) Green's 92 Motion to Strike Dft's Supplemental Evidentiary Submission is DENIED; 3) MOBIS's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to all of Green's claims, and Green's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 4) The state law claims against Powers (Counts 57 of the Amended Complaint) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 5) The trial of this case is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 2/5/2014. (furn: Calendar, wr)(term: Jury Selection and Jury Trial for 02/10/2014)(wcl, )
October 31, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 38 , which was filed on October 29, 2012, before Plaintiff sought leave to amend her pleadings, is STRICKEN from the record; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Original Complaint Against All Defendants 39 is GRANTED as further set out; Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 10/31/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Mobis Alabama, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noria C. Green
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobis Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Romano Osuch
Represented By: Henry Clay Barnett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Powers
Represented By: I. M. (Mike) Winter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?