Flournoy v. Harris et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Donnell Flournoy
Defendant: I. Harris, Kim Tobias Thomas, Warden Barry and Deputy Warden Edwards
Case Number: 2:2012cv00286
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is DENIED because the proposed amendment is futile. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/10/2016. (dmn, )
March 25, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 30 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, and it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Defendant's motion for summary judgment with respect to the claims for monetary damages lodged against him in his official capacities is GRANTED as Defendant is entitled to absolute immunity from these claims. 2. Defendant's motion for summary judgment with respect to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim lodged against him in all aspects of his individual capacity is DENIED. 3. This case is set for a Jury Trial before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III on Plaintiff's excessive force claim against Defendant in his individual capacity during the term of court commencing 11/16/2015, with Final Pretrial Conference to be held on 10/15/2015, before Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton III, at a time to be set by later order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 3/25/2015. Copies furnished to calendar group, EB.(dmn, )
April 17, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $6.38 be paid on or before 5/8/2012 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full; granting 3 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 4/17/12. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flournoy v. Harris et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Flournoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?