Poma-Pratt v. Thomas et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jimmy Poma-Pratt
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas, Officer Temple, Officer Tucker, Officer Freeman and Officer Brown
Case Number: 2:2012cv00291
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding Defendants' 141 Objections to Specific Exhibits Designated by Plaintiff. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants Objections to Exhibits 3, 4, 5, and 6 are SUSTAINED to the extent that if the Plaintiff co ntends that the Defendants have opened the door to the use of this evidence, the Plaintiff must first take it up admission of the evidence outside of the presence of the jury, and the court will take up any objection to the evidence at that time. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/9/2015. (dmn, )
November 5, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This cause is before the court on the Plaintiffs' 145 Objections to Specific Exhibits Designated by Defendant. The Plaintiffs object to exhibits listed by the Defendants as Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 6, 8, 9, 11, and 16. The court will rule on the Plaintiff's objection to the photographs at trial, after a proper foundation is laid for their admissibility. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/5/2015. (dmn, )
April 3, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ON MOTION directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $9.83 be paid on or before 4/23/2012; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Kilby Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/3/2012. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poma-Pratt v. Thomas et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Poma-Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Temple
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tucker
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Freeman
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Brown
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Represented By: Kathryn Daubenberger Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?