Loucks, et al. v. Shorest, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: Valerie Malissia Veazey Loucks and Amanda Victoria Woodham
Defendant: Shorest, LLC and RHI, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00304
Filed: April 3, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Chilton
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment (Doc. # 101 ) is DENIED as to the default judgment entered on liability; (2) This case will be set for trial by jury for the purpose of determining the amount of damages by separate Order at a later date. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 8/19/14. (scn, )
May 6, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plfs are given until noon on 5/7/2013 to supplement their response, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/6/2013. (wcl, )
May 1, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Exclude Witnesses Under "the Rule." Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/1/2013. (wcl, )
April 30, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1) The 53 Motion in Limine is GRANTED as to the Plfs' offering testimony of a legal conclusion as to "constructive discharge," and is DENIED as to the Plfs' testimony about emotional pain, embarrassment, and humiliation they suffered, linked to treatment experienced in their employment. The motion is held in abeyance in all other respects; 2) The Plfs are given until 5/3/2013 to specifically identify evidence of personal knowledge of affairs of Dr. Smith and other cases or claims they seek to admit at trial, together with the identify of any witnesses through whom such evidence would be elicited and briefing the basis for admission. The Dfts have until 5/8/2013 to respond in support of their motion in light of that identification of evidence. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/30/2013. (wcl, )
April 26, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the 60 Motion in Limine is GRANTED, as further set out in order; (2) because the remaining categories of evidence identified in the plaintiff's motion in limine are unclear and do not identify particular eviden ce, the Motion in Limine is DENIED as to evidence not known to the decision maker at the time of the decision and evidence of affirmative defenses not pled, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/26/13. (djy, )
March 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion for Writ of Attachment; denying as moot 34 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Motion for Writ Attachment. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/8/2013. (wcl, )
June 13, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 MOTION to Strike Dfts' Answer and Affirmative Defenses, or in the Alternative, Plfs' Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 6/13/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loucks, et al. v. Shorest, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Malissia Veazey Loucks
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Represented By: Karen E. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Victoria Woodham
Represented By: Alicia Kay Haynes
Represented By: Karen E. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorest, LLC
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHI, Inc.
Represented By: Rick A. Howard
Represented By: April Willis McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?