Threatt v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Kevin Threatt
Defendant: J. Wilson, Alabama Department of Corrections, Gary Hetzel and Sgt. Borders
Case Number: 2:2012cv00407
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 11 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that plaintiff's motion for voluntary dismissal of the complaint 10 is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/16/2012. (jg, )
June 25, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 5 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 1 is DENIED; and 2. This case is REFERRED back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/25/2012. (jg, )
May 4, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Threatt's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 1 is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to the assigned Magistrate Judge for action or recommendation on all pretrial matters. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 5/4/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Threatt v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Threatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?