Hollingsworth v. Thomas et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Hollingsworth
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas, Irvin Harris and Ms. Baker
Case Number: 2:2012cv00472
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 RECOMMENDATION; it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Plaintiff's 1 request for injunctive relief is DENIED as moot. 2. The 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Baker is GRANTED to the extent Defendant Baker seeks dismis sal of this case due to Plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy prior to filing this case. 3. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice against Defendant Baker under 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust an administrative remedy. 4. Defendant Thomas's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. 5. Defendant Harris's 28 Motion for Summary Judgment regarding the claim for monetary damages lodged against him in his official capacity is GRANTED as this Defendant is entitled to absolute immunity from this claim, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/18/2015. (kh, )
August 28, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 23 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, the Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby DENIED, and that that this case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 8/28/2012. (dmn, )
June 1, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $12.16 be paid on or before June 15, 2012; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Kilby CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/1/2012. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollingsworth v. Thomas et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Joseph Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin Harris
Represented By: Albert Sim Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?