Lohr v. Zehner et al

Plaintiff: Richard I. Lohr, II
Defendant: Joseph Earl Zehner, II and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00533
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2014 248 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf administrator Richard I. Lohr, II's 112 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Gordon J. Kirschberg is provisionally granted in part and denied in part as set forth in the above opinion. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/8/2014. (wcl, )
June 27, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Joseph Earl Zehner, III and United Parcel Service, Inc.'s 109 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/27/2014. (dmn, )
June 23, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Michael Napier, as further set forth in the opinion. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/23/2014. (wcl, )
May 9, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that, on or before 5/12/2014, dft Wilmac Enterprises, LLC is to file a corrected deposition or a statement indicating that the already-filed deposition is correct. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/9/2014. (wcl, )
January 22, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion to Continue and reset trial date, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/22/2014. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lohr v. Zehner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Earl Zehner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard I. Lohr, II
Represented By: Richard Duane Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?