Price v. Giles et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Timothy Price
Defendant: Sandra Giles and C. Smith
Case Number: 2:2012cv00567
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's 54 recommendation is adopted. (2) Judgment is entered in favor of defendant Sgt. C. Smith and against plaintiff Timothy Price, with plainti ff Price taking nothing by his complaint. It is further ORDERED that costs are taxed against plaintiff Price, for which execution may issue. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/9/2015. (kh, )
April 22, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that oral argument on the 44 motion for sanctions presently SET for April 27, 2015 be and is hereby RESET to April 30, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4B, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. The persons having custody of the plaintiff shall produce the plaintiff for this proceeding. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/22/2015. (furn: WS, ADOC Transport, USMS, Calendar)(kh, )
April 1, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the 34 motion to stay be and is hereby DENIED, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/1/2015. (kh, )
March 17, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Evidentiary Hearing for 4/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody, as further set out in order. The persons having custody of the plaintiff shall produce the plaintiff at the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/17/2015. (Furn: calendar, ws, ADOC Transport, USMS)(kh, )
October 4, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER that: 1. The 13 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED; 2. The plaintiff's complaint against the Warden at Bullock Correctional Facility be and is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and prior to service of process; 3. Defendant Warden at Bullock Correctional Facility be and is hereby DISMISSED as a party to the complaint pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and 4. This case, with respect to the remaining defendant, be and is hereby REFERRED BACK to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 10/4/2012. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Giles et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?