Petite v. Hetzel (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Isadore Petite
Defendant: Gary Hetzel, Kenneth Sconyers, Sherry Lightner, Larry Anglin, Felix Woods, Shawn Logan, Gwendolyn Babers, Joel Tew, Richard Hetrick, Walter Myers, James Tucker and Andrea Moorer
Case Number: 2:2012cv00706
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Referring Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2014 Filing 35 Received partial Filing fee: $ 11.90, receipt number 4602032467 (djy, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 34 Partial Filing fee received from Bullock Correctional Facility: $ 30.00, receipt number 4602032199 (dmn, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 33 Received partial Filing fee: $ 45.00, receipt number 4602031863 (djy, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 32 Partial Filing fee received from Bullock County Correctional Facility: $ 95.00, receipt number 4602031599 (dmn, )
February 6, 2014 Filing 31 Partial Filing fee received from Bullock County Correctional Facility: $ 31.80, receipt number 4602030240 (dmn, )
October 4, 2013 Filing 30 Partial Filing fee received: $ 10.00, receipt number 4602028580 (dmn, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 29 Received partial Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number 4602027653 (djy, )
April 25, 2013 Filing 28 Received partial Filing fee: $ 14.80, receipt number 4602026916 (djy, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 27 Partial Filing fee received: $ 53.00, receipt number 4602026370. (dmn, )
January 16, 2013 Filing 26 Received partial Filing fee: $ 10.00, receipt number 4602025614 (djy, )
December 14, 2012 Filing 25 Partial Filing fee: $8.00, receipt number 4602025274. (jg, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice; directing the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/27/12. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing as follows: (1) the #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge is ADOPTED; (2) plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction;. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/27/12. (djy, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing as follows: (1) the #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge is ADOPTED; (2) plaintiff's #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; and (3) this case is REFERRED back to the Mag Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/19/12. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist)(djy, )
November 15, 2012 No objections filed to the #18 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (No PDF document attached to this entry.)(scn, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 21 Received partial Filing fee: $ 8.00, receipt number 4602024911 (djy, )
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that Plaintiff's complaint be DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction; further ORDERED that Plaintiff may file an objection to the Recommendation on or before November 15, 2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/1/12. (scn, )
October 29, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Isadore Petite (djy, )
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: (1) The #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; and (2) This case be referred back the undersigned for additional proceedings; further ORDERED that on or before November 7, 2012, Plaintiff may file an objection to the Recommendation, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/24/12. (scn, )
October 3, 2012 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Larry Anglin, Gwendolyn Babers, Richard Hetrick, Gary Hetzel, Sherry Lightner, Shawn Logan, Andrea Moorer, Walter Myers, Kenneth Sconyers, Joel Tew, James Tucker, Felix Woods, filed by Isadore Petite.(djy, )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing that on or before 10/10/2012 plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a 42 USC 1983 complaint; plf's #1 original and #14 amended complaint shall be superseded by this amended complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/27/12. Mailed w/1983 complaint form to plaintiff, as directed.(djy, )
September 25, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, by Isadore Petite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(scn, )
September 25, 2012 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gary Hetzel, Kenneth Sconyers, Sherry Lightner, Larry Anglin, Felix Woods, Shawn Logan, Gwendolyn Babers, Joel Tew, Richard Hetrick, Walter Myers, James Tucker, and Andrea Moorer, filed by Isadore Petite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(scn, )
September 18, 2012 Filing 13 Received initial partial Filing fee: $ 19.50, receipt number 4602024203 (djy, )
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER WITHDRAWING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE Mag Judge entered 8/23/2012; directing the clerk to strike from the docket the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction as considered to be contained within plaintiff's #1 complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/7/12. (djy, )
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $19.50 be paid on or before 9/28/2012; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full; granting #2 , #9 motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Corr Facility, as directed.. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 9/7/12. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Isadore Petite. (scn, )
August 31, 2012 Filing 9 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Isadore Petite. (djy, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Alter, Amend or vacate #3 order denying motion for TRO, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/31/12. (djy, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT by Isadore Petite. (djy, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter, amend or vacate #3 Order denying Motion for TRO by Isadore Petite. (djy, )
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #12 ORDER) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Mag Judge that: (1) the MOTION for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED; (2) this case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings; Objections to R&R due by 9/6/2012. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/23/12. (djy, ) Modified on 9/7/2012 (djy, ).
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that on or before 9/4/2012 plf submit a complete in forma pauperis application, as further set out in order; (2) directing the clerk mail to plaintiff a form for use in filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/20/12. Mailed to plaintiff with form, as directed.(djy, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion for TRO; further ORDERING that this case is referred, pursuant to 28 USC 636(b) to the Mag Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/17/12. (Attachments: #1 civil appeals checklist) (djy, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Isadore Petite. (djy, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Gary Hetzel, filed by Isadore Petite.(djy, )
August 17, 2012 (STRIKING from the docket as considered to be contained within the plaintiffs complaint pursuant to #12 ORDER) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Isadore Petite. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket Entry #1 ). (djy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petite v. Hetzel (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isadore Petite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lightner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Babers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hetrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Moorer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?