Brand v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: James Edward Brand
Defendant: Gary Hetzel, Kenneth Sconyers and Shawn Logan
Case Number: 2:2012cv00940
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after an independent and de novo review of the record, it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The 19 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/21/13. (scn, )
January 18, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) Plaintiff's 14 objections to the Magistrate Judge's order are OVERRULED in part and SUSTAINED in part, as set out; (2) Plaintiff's 14 motion for reassignment of this case to a new Magistrate Judge is DENIE D; (3) The 11 order of the Magistrate Judge is VACATED in part, as set out; further ORDERED that Plaintiff file a second amended complaint on or before February 1, 2013, as further set out; the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send Mr. Brand a form for use in filing a complaint under § 1983; ORDERED that this case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/18/13. (scn, )
November 27, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that: (1) The 5 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) Plaintiff's 1 motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED; and (3) This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/27/12. (scn, )
October 29, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED, as further set out; further ORDERED that this case is REFERRED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), to the Magistrate Judge for all pretrial proceedings and entry of any orders or recommendations as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/29/12. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brand v. Hetzel et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?