Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP et al(MEMBER CASE)
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP and Crowe Horwath LLP
Petitioner: The Colonial BancGroup, Inc. and Kevin O'Halloran
Case Number: 2:2012cv00957
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
2 Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate as referral Judge. Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 113 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as referral judge. (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
October 23, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #111 Proposed Findings of Fact; the pleading should have only been filed in the Lead Case: 2:11cv746-BJR-TFM pursuant to the #92 consolidation order and is hereby STRICKEN from the record. (wcl, )
October 21, 2017 Filing 111 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #92 CONSENT CONSOLIDATION ORDER AND #112 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE) Proposed Findings of Fact by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, Steven) Modified on 10/23/2017 (wcl, ).
October 25, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #109 Joint Stipulation Concerning Jury Demand; the pleading should have only been filed in the Lead Case: 2:11cv746-BJR-TFM pursuant to the #92 consolidation order and is hereby STRICKEN from the record. (wcl, )
October 24, 2016 Filing 109 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #92 CONSENT CONSOLIDATION ORDER AND #110 NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Concerning Jury Demand between Kevin O'Halloran as Plan Trustee for the Colonial Bancgroup, Inc., The Colonial Bancgroup, Inc. and Crowe Horwath, LLP by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Parzen, Stanley) Modified on 10/25/2016 (wcl, ).
May 11, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of DOCKETING ERROR re #107 Order in this MEMBER case and is hereby STRICKEN as an erroneous docket entry due to clerical error. This order should have been entered in lead case 2:11-cv-00746-WKW-TFM. (kh, ).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 (STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY IN A MEMBER CASE - DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR) ORDERED that a telephonic conference is SET for May 12, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. (CDT). Counsel for Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers is DIRECTED to take all necessary action to coordinate and commence the conference call. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/11/2016. (furn: AR, Calendar)(kh, ) Modified on 5/11/2016 (kh, ). (Main Document 107 replaced on 5/11/2016) (kh, ).
September 2, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the pleading should have only been filed in the Lead Case: 2:11cv746-WKW-TFM pursuant to the consolidation order and is hereby STRICKEN from the record. (kh, )
August 21, 2015 Filing 105 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #106 NOTICE) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Novak, Tabor) Modified on 9/2/2015 (kh, ).
June 19, 2015 Filing 104 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, the pleading should have only been filed in the Lead Case: 2:11cv746-WKW-TFM pursuant to the consolidation order and is hereby STRICKEN from the record. (kh, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE of Non-Compliance re #99 Notice of Appearance, #101 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #98 Notice of Appearance, #97 Notice of Appearance, #100 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #102 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , these pleadings should have only been filed in the Lead Case: 2:11cv746-WKW-TFM pursuant to the consolidation order and are hereby STRICKEN from the record. (kh, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 102 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Gillis, Kristen) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 18, 2015 Filing 101 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 18, 2015 Filing 100 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Means, Tyrone) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 17, 2015 Filing 99 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone Carlton Means on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Means, Tyrone) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 17, 2015 Filing 98 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Lewis Gillis on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Gillis, Henry) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 17, 2015 Filing 97 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #103 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen J. Gillis on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Gillis, Kristen) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
June 16, 2015 Filing 96 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #104 NOTICE AND #92 ORDER) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bailey, Dennis) Modified on 6/19/2015 (kh, ).
November 21, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of ERROR re #94 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline 26(F) Report to reflect striking: motion should not be filed in MEMBER case. (scn, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 94 (STRICKEN AS ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY IN A MEMBER CASE) Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline 26(F) Report by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Turner, John) Modified on 11/21/2014 (scn, ).
September 25, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Correction re #89 Statement. The original pdf contained an inappropriate caption. The corrected pdf is attached to this notice. (Attachments: #1 Corrected pdf of Doc. #89 )(dmn, )
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 CONSENT CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases (Doc. #62 (2:11-CV-746)), it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in accordance with the terms subsequently agreed upon by the parties. (See Doc. #79-1, at 2 (2:11-CV-746).) (1) Until further ORDER of the court, Civil Actions 2:11-CV-746 and 2:12-CV-957 are CONSOLIDATED because the actions involve a "common question of law or fact." (2) To facilitate the Clerk of the Court's maintenance of the docket and to prevent the parties' duplicative filing of documents, Civil Action 2:11-CV-746 is DESIGNATED as the LEAD CASE, and all future motions, pleadings, notices, and other filings by the parties shall be filed only in the LEAD CASE. (3) Terry F. Moorer is ASSIGNED as the magistrate judge in Civil Action 2:11-cv-746. The undersigned will remain the district judge. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file this order in both the lead case (i.e. 2:11-CV-746) and the member case (i.e. 2:12-CV-957). Cases associated. MEMBER CASE. CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:11-cv-746-WKW is LEAD CASE. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/24/2014. (dmn, )
September 22, 2014 ***Attorney Richard Everett Biggs added PRO HAC VICE for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Rufus T Dorsey, IV, C. Edward Dobbs added for Kevin O'Halloran, and The Colonial BancGroup, Inc. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #91 for pdf)
September 22, 2014 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, The Colonial BancGroup, Inc., and Kevin O'Halloran. (Mullin, David) Modified on 9/23/2014 to add additional filers. (dmn, )
September 22, 2014 Filing 90 Response to #82 Order and Objection To Plaintiffs' Proposed Interim Discovery Plan (Dkt. #89 -3) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tanis, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/23/2014 to create links to Doc. #82 and #89 . (dmn, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 89 Response to #82 Order Statement as to Proposed Interim Discovery Plan and Objections of Other Parties by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Anderson, James) (Main Document 89 replaced on 9/22/2014 due to consolidated caption was used in error when originally filed.) (dmn, ) Modified on 9/22/2014 to create link to Doc. #82 . (dmn, )
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER granting #86 Motion to Withdraw as FDIC Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/18/2014. (dmn, )(NO PDF attached)
September 18, 2014 *** Attorney Matthew Jason Ford and James Bruce Perrine terminated pursuant to 88 Text Order. (dmn, )
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time to File Interim Discovery Plan to and including 9/19/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/17/2014. (dmn, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 86 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
September 16, 2014 Filing 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Interim Discovery Plan by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James)
September 5, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings (PDF ACCESS RESTRICTED FOR 90 DAYS) held on August 26, 2014, before Judge W. Keith Watkins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Risa L. Entrekin, Telephone number 334-240-2405. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION DUE WITHIN 7 BUSINESS DAYS. Redaction Request due 9/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2014. (dmn, )
September 2, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Ray Bailey on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Bailey, Dennis)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER: A status conference was held today in this case and in Case No. 2:11-cv-746. ORDER directing the parties to confer and develop an interim discovery plan for both cases to be filed by Stanley Parzen, attorney for Defendant Crowe Horwath LLP, on or before 9/9/2014 as further set out in the order. In the event the parties cannot reach agreement by 9/9/2014, Mr. Parzen shall file his proposal for an interim discovery plan on or before 9/16/2014 as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/26/2014. (dmn, )
August 26, 2014 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceeding held before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/26/2014 (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Risa Entrekin.) (ajr, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jason Ford on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Ford, Matthew)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that a Telephonic Status Conference be held on Tuesday, 8/26/2014 08:00 AM CDT before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins, to include counsel for the parties, counsel for the plaintiff in Case No. 2:11-cv-746, and the undersigned. Participants shall be prepared to discuss the procedural posture, pending motions, and a discovery plan in the above-styled case and in Case No. 2:11-cv-746. Counsel for Defendants are DIRECTED to take all necessary action to coordinate and commence the conference call. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/19/2014. Copies furnished to calendar group, AR.(dmn, )
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDERED that the deadline for the parties' Rule 26(f) report is STAYED until further order of the court. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/18/2014. (wcl, )
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER granting #76 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Rule 26(f) Report; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 8/14/2014. (No pdf attached to this entry)(wcl, )
August 13, 2014 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline File Rule 26(f) Report by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Mullin, David) Modified on 8/13/2014 to add as also filed on behalf of the dfts (wcl, ).
July 29, 2014 Filing 75 AMENDED ANSWER to Second #53 Amended Complaint, by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RULE 26(f) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/13/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/23/2014. (wcl, )
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #58 & #60 MOTIONS to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (wcl, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 72 Filing fee received for pro hac admissions fees for John Turner and Robert Bell for $100.00, receipt number 4602029767. (jg, )
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 & #70 Motions for Admission of Robert R. Bell and John G. Turner, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/30/2014. (wcl, )
January 24, 2014 Filing 70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Robert Bell)(Perrine, James)
January 24, 2014 Filing 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Perrine, James)
January 24, 2014 ***Attorney John G. Turner, Robert R. Bell for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation added pursuant to #69 and #70 motions. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER directing that the Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Seeking Consolidation of Cases. (Doc. #36 ) is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/21/14. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist) (scn, )
January 21, 2014 *** Attorneys Andrew P. Campbell and Caroline Smith Gidiere terminated as counsel for Movants Kevin O'Halloran and The Colonial BancGroup, Inc. pursuant to #68 Order. (scn, )
November 22, 2013 Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF in Support of its #58 Motion to Dismiss, in Part, the Second Amended Complaint filed by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James) Modified on 11/25/2013 to clarify text to reflect as in support of #58 motion (qc/djy, ).
November 22, 2013 Filing 66 REPLY BRIEF re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , in Part, the Second Amended Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2013 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION to Dismiss in part, the Second Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , in Part, the Second Amended Complaint filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Perrine, James)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 GENERAL BRIEFING ORDER setting out briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/25/2013. (dmn, )
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 BRIEFING ORDER setting out briefing schedule on dispositive motions. It is ORDERED that the #60 MOTION to Dismiss in part, the Second Amended Complaint filed by Crowe Horwath LLP be submitted without oral argument on 11/22/2013. Motion Submission Deadline set for 11/22/2013. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 11/15/2013. The defendant may file a reply brief on or before 11/22/2013. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/25/2013. (dmn, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 62 ANSWER to #53 Second Amended Complaint, by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP.(Tanis, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/21/2013 to clarify docket text (jg, ).
October 21, 2013 Filing 61 ANSWER to #53 Second Amended Complaint, by Crowe Horwath LLP.(Anderson, James) Modified on 10/21/2013 to clarify docket text (jg, ).
October 21, 2013 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss in part, the #53 Second Amended Complaint by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James) Modified on 10/21/2013 to add link to docket entry (jg, ).
October 21, 2013 Filing 59 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , in Part, the Second Amended Complaint filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth)
October 21, 2013 Filing 58 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, in Part, the #53 Second Amended Complaint by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/21/2013 to add link to entry (jg, ).
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time or to Answer or Otherwise Respond #54 is GRANTED. Defendants shall have thirty days to answer Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint from its date of filing. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/1/2013. (jg, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Docketing Error: re #55 MOTION for Order: The document was e-filed by counsel on 9/20/2013 as a motion and should have been docketed as a proposed order to document #54 and is stricken as a docketing error. (jg, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 55 Terminated as a docketing error: MOTION for Order re #54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #53 Amended Complaint (unopposed) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Novak, Tabor) Modified on 9/23/2013 (jg, ).
September 20, 2013 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #53 Amended Complaint (unopposed) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Novak, Tabor)
September 20, 2013 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crowe Horwath LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Perrine, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2013: #1 Correct Certificate of Service) (jg, ). Modified on 9/23/2013 to correct docket text (jg, ).
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #21 , #22 are DENIED. The FDIC has leave to file an amended complaint to include factual allegations plausibly connecting the double- and triple-pledging scheme alleged in Paragraph 21 to conduct of PwC on or before September 16, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/10/2013. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(jg, )
August 16, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Bruce Perrine (Perrine, James)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER that the #47 motion for protective is GRANTED as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/15/2013. (jg, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that the Joint Motion to Stay Discovery #47 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/24/2013. (jg, )
April 22, 2013 MOTION for Protective Order by Crowe Horwath LLP, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. See #47 for this docket entry. (No pdf for this entry) (jg, )
April 22, 2013 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Kevin O'Halloran, The Colonial BancGroup, Inc.. (Campbell, Andrew)
April 22, 2013 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovry and For Protective Order by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Crowe Horwath LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perrine, James) Modified on 4/23/2013 to add joint filers (jg, ).
April 17, 2013 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Response to FDIC's Sur-Reply #40 filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers's Motion for Leave to File Response to Sur-Reply #44 is GRANTED as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/17/2013. (jg, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Sur-Reply by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tanis, Elizabeth)
April 15, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
April 15, 2013 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2013: #1 Correct Certificate of Service) (jg, ).
April 15, 2013 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A and B)(Anderson, James)
April 8, 2013 Filing 40 REPLY BRIEF re #35 Reply Brief FDIC Sur-Reply to PwC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perrine, James)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply #38 , it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff should file an exact duplicate of the proposed sur-reply attached to its motion. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/8/2013. (jg, )
April 5, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendant PwC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A - Sur-Reply with exhibit)(Perrine, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2013: #2 Correct Certificate of Service) (jg, ).
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: re #36 MOTION to Intervene for Purpose of Seeking Consolidation, that the parties respond on or before April 15, 2013; To the extent their interests align, the parties are encouraged, but are not required, to submit joint responses. BancGroup may, but is not required to, reply no later than April 22, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/1/2013. (jg, )
March 26, 2013 ***Attorney Caroline Smith Gidiere for Kevin O'Halloran and The Colonial BancGroup, Inc. added pursuant to #36 motion. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
March 26, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Consolidate Cases by The Colonial BancGroup, Inc., Kevin O'Halloran. (Attachments: #1 BancGroup Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Andrew)
March 22, 2013 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Tanis, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2013 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF re #32 Response in Opposition to Motion, #33 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James)
February 22, 2013 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
February 22, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #30 Joint MOTION for entry of Scheduling Order; Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's #21 Motion to Dismiss is deemed directed at Plaintiff' s First Amended Complaint, as is Defendant Crowe Horwath LLP's #22 , #23 Motion to Dismiss ; The instructions and deadlines set out in the court's earlier #19 Scheduling Order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/15/13. (djy, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Consent Scheduling Order by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Crowe Horwath LLP, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tanis, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/14/2013 (jg, ).
January 28, 2013 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Crowe Horwath LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Perrine, James)
January 11, 2013 Filing 28 Filing fee received for pro hac admissions fees for Stanley J. Parzen and Jonathan C. Medow for $100.00, receipt number 4602025550. (jg, )
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the #26 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan C. Medow is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/2013. (jg, )
January 9, 2013 Filing 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan C. Medow by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, James) Modified on 1/9/2013 to clarify docket text (jg, ).
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the #24 Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Stanley J. Parzen is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/9/2013. (jg, )
January 8, 2013 Filing 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stanley J. Parzen for Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, James) Modified on 1/9/2013 to clarify docket text (jg, ).
January 7, 2013 ***Attorney Stanley J Parzen and Jonathan C. Medow for Crowe Horwath LLP added pursuant to #22 motion to dismiss. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
January 7, 2013 Filing 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support Of #22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Anderson, James) Modified on 1/8/2013 to add link to motion and clarify docket text (jg, ).
January 7, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James)
January 7, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Tanis, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2012 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Crowe Horwath LLP waiver sent on 11/8/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. (Perrine, James)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER; Joint Motion for Entry of a Scheduling Order for Motions toDismiss #15 is GRANTED as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/27/2012. (jg, )
November 26, 2012 Filing 18 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Crowe Horwath LLP. (Anderson, James)
November 21, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James Harold Anderson on behalf of Crowe Horwath LLP (Anderson, James)
November 20, 2012 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP waiver sent on 11/8/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. (Perrine, James)
November 20, 2012 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Order Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order for Motions to Dismiss by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
November 20, 2012 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Crowe Horwath on 11/08/2012 by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
November 20, 2012 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Pricewaterhousecoopers on 11/08/2012 by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Perrine, James)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Upon consideration of the motions of Defendant PricewaterhouseCoopers to admit counsel pro hac vice #9 & #10 are GRANTED, and that Elizabeth V. Tanis and Drew D. Dropkin are admitted pro hac vice as counsel in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 11/15/2012. (jg, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins and Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer. Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer no longer assigned to the case as Presiding Judge. (jg, )
November 14, 2012 Motions No Longer Referred: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice no longer referred to Judge Moorer pursuant to #11 notice. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Drew D. Dropkin) (Filing fee $50.00 receipt number 4602024918.) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Receipt)(jg, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Elizabeth V. Tanis (Filing fee $50.00 receipt number 4602024918.) by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Receipt)(jg, )
November 13, 2012 ***Attorney Elizabeth V Tanis,Drew David Dropkin for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP added pursuant to #6 notice of appearance. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the #3 , #4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorneys John M. Brown, Clint R. Latham, and David C. Mullin are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/13/2012. (jg, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Novak, Tabor)
November 13, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tabor Robert Novak, Jr on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Novak, Tabor)
November 13, 2012 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
November 2, 2012 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David C. Mullin (Filing fee $50.00 receipt number 4602024714.) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(jg, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Clint R. Latham (Filing fee $50.00 receipt number 4602024714.) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(jg, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John M. Brown (Filing fee $50.00 receipt number 4602024714.) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(jg, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (jg, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crowe Horwath LLP, PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 4602024714.), filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(jg, )
October 31, 2012 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. See #1 complaint for this docket entry. (No pdf for this docket entry) (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP et al(MEMBER CASE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: John M Brown
Represented By: Robert R. Bell
Represented By: Tyrone Carlton Means
Represented By: Matthew Jason Ford
Represented By: David C Mullin
Represented By: James Bruce Perrine
Represented By: Dennis Ray Bailey
Represented By: Kristen Jordana Gillis
Represented By: Clint R. Latham
Represented By: Richard Everett Biggs
Represented By: John G. Turner, III
Represented By: Henry Lewis Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Colonial BancGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: Caroline Smith Gidiere
Represented By: Rufus T Dorsey, IV
Represented By: C. Edward Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin O'Halloran
Represented By: Andrew Phillip Campbell
Represented By: Caroline Smith Gidiere
Represented By: Rufus T Dorsey, IV
Represented By: C. Edward Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Represented By: Elizabeth V Tanis
Represented By: Tabor Robert Novak, Jr.
Represented By: Drew David Dropkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowe Horwath LLP
Represented By: Jonathan C. Medow
Represented By: Stanley J Parzen
Represented By: James Harold Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?