Oliver v. Napier et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: David O. Oliver
Defendant: Frank Albright, Victor Napier and The Segregation Board of Kilby Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2013cv00014
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) The 34 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2) Plf's action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/9/2013. (wcl, )
June 7, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: (1) The 30 Recommendation is ADOPTED; (2) Plf's 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; and (3) This case is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/7/2013. (wcl, )
April 17, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/17/2013. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Napier et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David O. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Segregation Board of Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?