J.J.A.W. v. Strange (MAG+)

Plaintiff: J.J.A.W.
Defendant: Luther Strange
Case Number: 2:2013cv00157
Filed: March 14, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the memorandum opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation 31 is adopted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all outstanding motions are denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that costs are taxed against plaintiff, for which execution may issue. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/10/2013. (jg, )
July 11, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that, on or before August 1, 2013, the Plaintiff shall show cause why the Defendant's motion to dismiss 25 should not be granted as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/11/2013. (jg, )
May 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Order and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 6 be and is hereby WITHDRAWN; that, on or before June 19, 2013, J.J.A.W. shall file an amended complaint on his own behalf as further set out; that, on or before June 19, 2013, J.J.A.W., or an attorney on his behalf, shall file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/29/2013. (jg, )
April 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION for Extension of time; further ORDERING that the parties may file Objections to R&R on or before 5/16/2013, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/22/13. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.J.A.W. v. Strange (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.J.A.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?