Hatcher v. Wynne et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Hatcher
Defendant: William Wynne, Robert Longshore, Cliff Walker, Velinda Weatherly, Cynthia Dillard, Eddie Cook and Phil Bryant
Case Number: 2:2013cv00226
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on April 8, 2016. There being no timely objection to the Recommendation, and after a de novo review of the file, the Recommendation is ADOPTED, and it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The def endants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.2. Judgment is GRANTED in favor of the defendants. 3. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. 4. Costs are taxed against the plaintiff. 5. Final Judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 5/2/2016. (kh, )
June 19, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING plaintiff's 20 Objection; further ORDERING that this case is REFERRED back to the Mag Judge for appropriate action. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 6/19/13. (djy, )
May 17, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, after an independent review of the file, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The plaintiff's 5 objection to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; (2) The 4 Recommendation of th e Magistrate Judge is adopted; (3) The request for monetary damages is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii) as the defendants are entitled to immunity from such damages. (4) The claims arising from actions/decisions which occurred on o r before April 8, 2011 are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) due to the plaintiff's failure to file the complaint within the time prescribed by the applicable period of limitation; (5) The d iscrimination claim is summarily dismissed in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) because the mere differential treatment of inmates does not violate the Constitution; (6) This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate orders or recommendations on plaintiff's remaining claims. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 5/17/13. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatcher v. Wynne et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velinda Weatherly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?