Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. et al v. Bentley et al

Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc., Reproductive Health Services and June Ayers
Defendant: Robert Bentley, Luther Strange, Ellen Brooks, Brandon K. Falls, Ashley Rich, Donald E. Williamson, George C. Smith, Jr., James E. West and Martha Lavender
Case Number: 2:2013cv00405
Filed: June 11, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the 294 MOTION is Granted as follows: (1) the court finds that plfs are "prevailling parties" under 42 USC 1988; (2) plfs, defs, and their counsel represent that the parties have negotiated a resolution for all c laims for costs and attorneys' fees; (3) in accordance with the parties' negotiated resolution, plfs' 277 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Non-Taxable Expenses is GRANTED as follows: Defs are to pay $ 1,700,000 (one million seve n hundred thousand and 00/100 dollars) to plaintiffs counsel, and such payment will satisfy all claims made by plaintiffs for attorneys fees and costs, taxable and non-taxable, in this matter; Payment shall be made within sixty (60) days of this order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/5/16. (djy, )
April 12, 2016 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) plfs' 277 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs is set for final submission, without oral argument, on 8/12/2016; (2) plfs are to file a Brief and evidentiary materials by 7/15/2016, as further set out; (3) def s are to file their Response and any evidentiary materials by 8/5/2016, as further set out; (4) plfs may file a Reply Brief by 8/12/2016; (5) the discussion of the evidence in the briefs must be accompanied by a specific reference, by page and line, to where the evidence can be found, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/12/16. (djy, )
October 24, 2014 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the court wishes to correct errata in regards to the initial 238 opinion entered on 8/4/2014; directing that the following changes are made, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/24/14. (djy, )
October 20, 2014 259 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 10/20/14. (djy, )
August 18, 2014 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) the plaintiffs are to file a supplemental brief by 9/2/2014; (2) defendants are to do the same by 9/16/2014; (3) the plaintiffs may file a reply by 9/23/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/18/14. (djy, )
July 31, 2014 237 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO COUNSEL that the opinion will be entered by next Monday, August 4, 2014, as further set out in notice. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/31/14. (djy, )
June 6, 2014 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the objections as to the following exhibits are overruled and that these exhibits are admitted: (1) Plaintiffs' Exhibits 29, 33, and 34; (2) Defendants' Exhibits 49, 60, 61, 73, 82, 83, and 84, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/6/14. (djy, ) .
May 13, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the exhibits listed in the 177 Joint Exhibit List are admitted. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/13/14. (djy, )
April 2, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the plaintiffs are to file their pretrial brief by 5/8/2014, the defendants are to do the same by 5/13/2014; and the plaintiffs may file a reply by 5/15/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/2/14. (djy, )
April 1, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Non-Jury Trial is set for 5/19/2014, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 2FMJ, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/1/2014. (furn: calendar, ag) (wcl, )
March 19, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) granting 143 joint request to extend the temporary restraining order; (2) the 49 Temporary Restraining order enjoining enforcement of § 4(c) of HB 57, shall remain in effect until April 2, 2014, at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/14. (djy, )
July 11, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that the re 64 MOTION TO DISMISS is set for Submission, without oral argument, on 7/31/2013, with the plaintiff to file their Response by 7/19/2013, and defendant Bentley to file a Reply by 7/31/2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/11/13. (djy, )
July 9, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Joint Motion to extend the temporary restraining order ; the temporary restraining order enjoining enforcement of § 4(c) of HB 57 shall remain in effect until August 15, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/9/13. (djy, )
June 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows with regard to the plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order 3 : (1) The defendants are to file a response by June 25, 2013; and (2) The plaintiffs may file a reply by noon on June 27, 2013; and (3) The court will issue a ruling on the motion by no later than June 28, 2013. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/13/2013. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc. et al v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Planned Parenthood Southeast, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Beck
Represented By: Jennifer Dalven
Represented By: Roger Kraus Evans
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: M. Wayne Sabel, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reproductive Health Services
Represented By: Andrew David Beck
Represented By: Jennifer Dalven
Represented By: Roger Kraus Evans
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: M. Wayne Sabel, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Ayers
Represented By: Andrew David Beck
Represented By: Jennifer Dalven
Represented By: Roger Kraus Evans
Represented By: Carrie Y. Flaxman
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Randall C Marshall
Represented By: M. Wayne Sabel, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Represented By: Andrew L Brasher
Represented By: David Bryson Byrne, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: Carrie Ellis McCollum
Represented By: John Cowles Neiman, Jr.
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Represented By: Andrew L Brasher
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: John Cowles Neiman, Jr.
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Brooks
Represented By: Andrew L Brasher
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: John Cowles Neiman, Jr.
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon K. Falls
Represented By: Andrew L Brasher
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: John Cowles Neiman, Jr.
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Rich
Represented By: Andrew L Brasher
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Howell
Represented By: John Cowles Neiman, Jr.
Represented By: William G. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Williamson
Represented By: Phillip Brian Hale
Represented By: Patricia Elaine Ivie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: James Robert Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. West
Represented By: Wayne Paulk Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Lavender
Represented By: Chad Wesley Bryan
Represented By: Barbara Jean Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?