Fuller v. Nearer et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: David Boy Fuller
Defendant: Lt. Nearer, Sgt. Talley, Officer Grant, Officer Fleeton, Sgt. Turner, Officer Eastwood, Sgt. Blair, Sgt. Washington, Officer Donaldson, Sgt. McCall, D. Davis, Nurse Slader, Nurse Merrit, Nurse Phelps, Officer Eaves and D. Harris
Case Number: 2:2013cv00417
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED as follows: 1) Plf's 69 Objection is OVERRULED; 2) The court adopts the 60 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge; 3) Dft's 25 , 27 , & 39 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED; 4) Plf's federal law claims are DISMIS SED with prejudice; 5) The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Plf's state law claims and they are DISMISSED without prejudice; 6) Judgment will be entered in favor of the Dfts and against the Plf. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/16/2016. (wcl, )
September 12, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 60 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED as follows: 1) Dfts' 25 , 27 , and 39 motions for summary judgment are GRANTED; 2) Plf's supplemental state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice; 3) This case is DISMISSED with prejudice; 4) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Dfts and against the Plf; 5) Costs are taxed against Plf. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/12/2016. (wcl, )
October 7, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 1. The plaintiff's objection 13 filed on July 26, 2013 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 6 filed on July 9, 2013 is adopted; 3. Plaintiff's § 1983 cla ims of inadequate medical care and treatment against Defendants Blair, Donaldson, and McCall are DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service as further set out; 4. Plaintiff's verbal abuse claim against Defendant Davis is DISMISSED with prejudice prior to service of process as further set out; 5. Plaintiff's access to courts claim against Defendant Eastwood is DISMISSED as further set out; 6. Defendants Blair, Donaldson, McCall, Davis, and Eastwood are DISMISSED as parties to the complaint; 7. This case with respect to Plaintiff's complaint against the remaining defendants is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Truman M. Hobbs on 10/7/2013. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Nearer et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Boy Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Nearer
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Talley
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grant
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Fleeton
Represented By: Thomas T. Gallion, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Slader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Merrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?