Spivey v. Cigna Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Ryan D. Spivey
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna Group Insurance, Cigna Corporation and United Technologies Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 2:2013cv00461
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
0 Judge: W. Harold Albritton
1 Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The 55 Motion for Leave to File a Reply is GRANTED. 2. The 32 Motion to Suspend, Alter or Vacate the Court's Order Dismissing Cigna Corporation Pending Completion of Limited Discovery on Agency Jurisdiction is DENIED as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/12/2013. (dmn, )
November 22, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 51 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and the Defendants are given until 12/9/2013 to file a response to Plaintiff's Supplemental brief. Counsel are advised that the court expects them to be readily available to opposing counsel, as well as to the court, as long as this case is pending. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 11/22/2013. (dmn, )
September 12, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Plaintiffs Complaint (Doc. 9 ) is GRANTED and Count II is DISMISSED. 2. The Motion to Dismiss Cigna Corporation (Doc. 11 ) is GRANTED and Cigna Corporation is DISMISSED without prejudice. 3. The Motion to Dismiss Cigna Group Insurance (Doc. 13 ) is GRANTED and Cigna Group Insurance is DISMISSED without prejudice. 4. The Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Doc. 11-2 or, in the Alternative, to Convert Defendants Motion to Dismiss Cigna Corporation from a Motion to Dismiss to a Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 21 ) is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/12/2013. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spivey v. Cigna Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: Katherine L Soppet
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Corporation
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: Katherine L Soppet
Represented By: William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan D. Spivey
Represented By: Thomas O'Neal Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?