Wells v. Gourmet Services Inc. et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Lawrence Wells
Defendant: Gourmet Services Inc., Al Baker, Gil Jones, Tia Benton, Charles Jones and Jasper Manuel
Case Number: 2:2013cv00516
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2016 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the petition for attorney's fees (Doc. # 170 ) is GRANTED and that Defendants are liable to Plaintiff for an attorney's fee in the amount of $5,400.00, payable on or before January 31, 2017. Failure to timely pay the atto rney's fee may result in the striking of all affirmative defenses (see Doc. # 163 at 4 2) or other appropriate sanctions. Further, upon consideration of Plaintiff's status report (Doc. # 173 ), it is ORDERED that, on or before December 22, 2016, the parties shall file a joint status report, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/14/2016. (kh, )
June 17, 2016 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 169 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/17/2016. (dmn, )
May 23, 2016 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants' 140 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/23/2016. (kh, )
July 15, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 96 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED as further set out in the order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/15/2015. (dmn, )
January 27, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Mr. Wells's 74 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery and File Dispositive Motion is DENIED as further set out in the opinion and order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/27/2015. (dmn, )
September 9, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that: 1. The 64 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. 2. That, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's Title VII claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment, wrongful discharge, anddeprivation of pay on the basis of national origin is dismissed with prejudice;3. That, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment in violation of Title VII on the basis of his race is dismissed with prejudice; 4. That, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells'sclaim that he was deprived of pay in violation of Title VII on the basis of his race is dismissed with prejudice; 5. That, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's claim subjected to unlawful retaliation in violation of Title VII i s dismissed with prejudice; 6. That Wells's state law claims is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; 7. That, in all other respects, the motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 37 ) is denied; and 8. That this case proceed solely on Wells's FLSA claim. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/9/2014. (dmn, )
July 21, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Wells's 4/30/2014 ORAL Motion to Amend his 47 Amended Complaint to include a claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment, wrongful discharge, and deprivation of pay in violation of Title VII on the basis of national o rigin be and is hereby GRANTED. Further, it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that the motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 37 ) be granted to the following extent: 1. that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 19 15(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's Title VII claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment, wrongful discharge, and deprivation of pay on the basis of national origin be dismissed with prejudice; 2. that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's claim that he was subjected to a hostile work environment in violation of Title VII on the basis of his race be dismissed with prejudice;3. that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's claim that he was deprived of pay in violation of Title VII on the basis of his race be dismissed with prejudice; 4. that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) and 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), Wells's claim su bjected to unlawful retaliation in violation of Title VII be dismissed with prejudice; 5. that Wells's state law claims be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; 6. that, in all other respects, the motion for judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 37 ) be denied; and 7. that this case proceed solely on Wells's FLSA claim. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2014. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/21/2014. (dmn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Gourmet Services Inc. et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gourmet Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gil Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tia Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?