Broadway v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Joseph J. Broadway
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Shane Anderson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00628
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2016 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 92 is granted and this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all other pending motions in thisaction are denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Keith Starrett on 5/20/2016. (kh, )
May 28, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Mr. Broadway's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Doc. # 78 ) is DENIED, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on May 28, 2015. (scn, )
December 18, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/18/2014. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph J. Broadway
Represented By: Gregory William Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Dennis Hughes
Represented By: Felicia Abernathy Long
Represented By: Bert Sheffield Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Anderson
Represented By: Charles Dennis Hughes
Represented By: Felicia Abernathy Long
Represented By: Bert Sheffield Nettles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?