Frazier v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)

Plaintiff: Demetrius Frazier
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas and Gary Hetzel
Case Number: 2:2013cv00781
Filed: October 21, 2013
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiff's second amended complaint on or before 10/22/2015. After reviewing Defendants' answer, on 11/4/2015 at 2: 00 PM, C.S.T., in Courtroom 2-B, in Montgomery, AL, the court will hold a Joint Status Conference, on the record, before Chief Judge William Keith Watkins in this case and four other 42 U.S.C. § 1983 cases involving lethal injection challenges c urrently pending before it (i.e., Grayson v. Dunn, et al., 2:12-cv-316-WKW; Roberts v. Myers, et al., 2:14-cv-1028-WKW; Myers v. Myers, et al.,2:14-cv-1029-WKW; and Hunt v. Myers, et al., 2:14-cv-1030-WKW). This caseand the four other § 1983 cas es identified above shall be hereinafter collectively referred to in this Order and any further Orders from the court in this matter as the Midazolam Litigation. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/8/2015. (dmn, ) Copies furnished to calendar group, AR.
March 19, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as follows: 1. This proceeding is STAYED generally. 2. Within fourteen (14) days from the Supreme Courts decision in Glossip, the parties shall jointly, if possible, or individually, if not, file a statement or appropriate motion that informs t he court of their respective positions on the issues in this case in view of the Glossip decision as further set out in the order. 3. The States Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 21 ) is DENIED with LEAVE to REFILE following the Supreme Courts decision in Glossip. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/19/2015. (dmn, )
January 5, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) Frazier's 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; it is GRANTED to the extent Frazier is permitted to amend his Eighth Amendment and Fourt eenth Amendment equal protection claims, and DENIED in all other respects; Frazier shall file, in accordance with Local Rule 15.1, a revised amended complaint that reflects the courts holdings herein, no later than seven (7) days after entry of this Order; (2) the State's 8 MOTION TO DISMISS is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 1/5/15. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Thomas et al (DEATH PENALTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Frazier
Represented By: John Anthony Palombi(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Tobias Thomas
Represented By: James Roy Houts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hetzel
Represented By: James Roy Houts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?