Young v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Tommy Lee Young
Defendant: State of Alabama and Karla Jones
Case Number: 2:2014cv00133
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Barbour
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 23 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure of Plf to prosecute this action and to comply with orders of the court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/10/2014. (wcl, )
April 1, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1) The 3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2) The 1 motion for preliminary injunction filed by the plf is DENIED; 3) This case is referred back to the US Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/1/2014. (wcl, )
March 7, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Easterling Corr Fac. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/7/14. Furnished to cashier. (djy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Lee Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?