Boston v. Hospital Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bonnie Boston
Defendant: Hospital Holdings, Inc., Robert Devrnja and Don Muhlenthaler
Case Number: 2:2014cv00240
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Covington
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Presiding Judge: W. Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Pursuant to §216 of the Fair Labor Standards Act (Doc. # 68 ) is GRANTED with respect to a collective actio n as described in this Memorandum Opinion; (2) The parties are Directed to file with the court an agreed upon Notice and Consent to Join, which includes an agreed-upon definition of the members of the collective action, on or before March 23, 2015. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 03/09/2015. (scn, )
December 1, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing as follows: (1) The Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 57 ) is GRANTED and the Plaintiffs are permitted to file the Second Amended Complaint attached to their Motion (Doc. # 57 -1); (2) The Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 52 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/01/14. (scn, )
September 11, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon consideration of Hospital Holdings, Inc.'s Reply to the Plaintiffs' Response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 44 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs have until September 17, 2014 to respond to Hospital Holdings, Inc.'s contention that it is entitled to fees and costs. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 9/11/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston v. Hospital Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Boston
Represented By: Robert Joseph Camp(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Gregory O'Dell Wiggins(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Devrnja
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Muhlenthaler
Represented By: Michael Ryan Franz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?