Neelley v. Walker, et al.
Plaintiff: Judith A. Neelley
Defendant: Clifford Walker, William W. Wynne, Jr. and Robert P. Longshore
Case Number: 2:2014cv00269
Filed: April 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Elmore
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Presiding Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER as follows: 1. The Joint Motion for Entry of Corrected Order Concerning Costs and Attorneys Fees (Doc. 100 ) is GRANTED; 2. The courts 5/10/2018 Order (Doc. 99 ) is VACATED; 3. In accordance with the parties negotiated resolution, the St ate of Alabama shall pay to the benefit of counsel for Plaintiff the sum $66,896.78 (sixty-six thousand eight hundred ninety-six and 78/100 dollars) in satisfaction of all claims for costs and attorneys fees in this matter. Such payment shall be made as follows: $65,396.78 (sixty-five thousand three hundred ninety-six and 78/100 dollars) to Sirote and Permutt, P.C., and $1500.00 (one thousand five hundred and 00/100 dollars) to McPhillips Shinbaum, LLP; 4. Such payments wil l satisfy all claims for attorneys fees and costs, taxable and non-taxable, in this matter. Payment shall be made within sixty (60) days of the entry of this order; and 5. Plaintiffs Petition for Attorneys Fees (Doc. 96 ), Plaintiffs Supplemental P etition for Attorney Fees and Petition Supporting Sirotes Firm Petition for Attorney Fees (Doc. 97 ), and the parties Joint Motion for Entry of Order Concerning Costs and Attorneys Fees (Doc. 98 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/16/2018. (dmn, )
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The 98 Joint Motion for Entry of Order Concerning Costs and Attorneys' Fees is GRANTED; 2) In accordance with the parties' negotiated resolution, that the State of Alabama shall pay to the benefit of counsel for Plf the sum $65,396.78 (sixty-five thousand three hundred ninety-six and 78/100 dollars) in satisfaction of all claims for costs and attorneys' fees in this matter; 3) Such payments will satisfy all claims for attorneys' f ees and costs, taxable and non-taxable, in this matter. Payment shall be made within 60 days of the entry of this order; and 4) Plf's 96 Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Plf's 97 Supplemental Petition for Attorney Fees and Petition Supporting Sirote's Firm Petition for Attorney Fees are DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 5/10/2018. (wcl, )
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that Plf's 79 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Dfts' 81 second motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/30/2018. (wcl, )
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING defs' 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/25/16. (djy, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER as follows: (1) Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Compel be and is hereby GRANTED as further set out in the order; and (2) The parties have until on or before 10/29/2015 to submit a joint proposed protective order to govern the documents to be produced. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/22/2015. (dmn, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neelley v. Walker, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Neelley
Represented By: Julian Lenwood McPhillips, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Alan Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. Wynne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Longshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?