Davis v. Automatic Food Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sundee Ann Davis
Defendant: Automatic Food Service, Inc., Pamela Little, James Leon McGaughy, James Ray & Associates, LLC, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv00308
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf Sundee Ann Davis's 78 motion for leave to file plf's third amended complaint is granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/17/2015. (wcl, )
August 21, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that plaintiff Sundee Ann Davis's motion to serve defendant James Leon McGaughy by publication (doc. no. 47 ) is denied. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/21/14. (scn, )
May 8, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the plaintiff has until May 12, 2014, to amend the complaint to allege jurisdiction sufficiently, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/8/14. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Automatic Food Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sundee Ann Davis
Represented By: Julia Ann Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Food Service, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Mitchell Henry
Represented By: Thomas Michael McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Little
Represented By: Dennis Mitchell Henry
Represented By: Thomas Michael McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Leon McGaughy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ray & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Christopher Waller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex Lafayette Holtsford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?