Powell v. Hutson et al

Plaintiff: Tiffany Powell
Defendant: Bobby Hutson and Enterprise Leasing Company South Central, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00406
Filed: June 2, 2014
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Based on the representations made on the record on 8/26/2015, it is ORDERED that the objections (doc. Nos. 41 and 42 ( 1 & 3)) are overruled, with leave to renew at trial. At that time, the court will have had an opportunity to consider the objections in full context, that is, in light of the factual evidence as well as after having read the entire depositions. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/28/2015. (dmn, )
August 18, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' objections (doc. nos. 7 , 8 , 9 , 18 , 19 , 24 , 27 , 28 , 29 , 41 , & 42 ), it is ORDERED that counsel for all parties are to do the following: (1) Meet, in person, by no later than 8/24/2015 , to attempt to resolve ALL of the above objections; and (2) File a jointly prepared report by 8/31/2015, (a) as to which issues in the objections are resolved and which ones remain unresolved and (b), for each and every unresolved issue, setting forth in detail the position of each side. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/18/2015. (dmn, )
July 20, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that plaintiff Tiffany Powell's 38 motion to dismiss is granted and that Counts III, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, X, and XI are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/20/2015. (kh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Hutson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Powell
Represented By: Guy Rodney Willis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Hutson
Represented By: Tommy Carrell Ritter, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company South Central, L.L.C.
Represented By: Tommy Carrell Ritter, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?